California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR184 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/15/2018

                    Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)February 26, 2018 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Many residents of the County of Alpine, including many Washoe Tribal members and other community members, served in the United States military during the Vietnam war with the support of friends, family, and loves ones; andWHEREAS, The naming of this section of State Route 88 will recognize the contributions and sacrifices of these veterans, their friends, families, and loved ones; andWHEREAS, This action will help upgrade the Vietnam war from being classified as the Forgotten War; andWHEREAS, This action of patriotism would serve our Vietnam veterans; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 88 from the Nevada state line (approximately post mile 25) to 5 miles southwest (post mile 20) in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)February 26, 2018 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

 Enrolled  August 15, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 05, 2018

Enrolled  August 15, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  August 13, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  April 05, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184

Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)February 26, 2018

Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)
February 26, 2018

 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Many residents of the County of Alpine, including many Washoe Tribal members and other community members, served in the United States military during the Vietnam war with the support of friends, family, and loves ones; and

WHEREAS, The naming of this section of State Route 88 will recognize the contributions and sacrifices of these veterans, their friends, families, and loved ones; and

WHEREAS, This action will help upgrade the Vietnam war from being classified as the Forgotten War; and

WHEREAS, This action of patriotism would serve our Vietnam veterans; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 88 from the Nevada state line (approximately post mile 25) to 5 miles southwest (post mile 20) in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway; and be it further

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.