California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR184 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184 CHAPTER 148 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Many residents of the County of Alpine, including many Washoe Tribal members and other community members, served in the United States military during the Vietnam war with the support of friends, family, and loves ones; andWHEREAS, The naming of this section of State Route 88 will recognize the contributions and sacrifices of these veterans, their friends, families, and loved ones; andWHEREAS, This action will help upgrade the Vietnam war from being classified as the Forgotten War; andWHEREAS, This action of patriotism would serve our Vietnam veterans; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 88 from the Nevada state line (approximately post mile 25) to 5 miles southwest (post mile 20) in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly April 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)February 26, 2018 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, Many residents of the County of Alpine, including many Washoe Tribal members and other community members, served in the United States military during the Vietnam war with the support of friends, family, and loves ones; andWHEREAS, The naming of this section of State Route 88 will recognize the contributions and sacrifices of these veterans, their friends, families, and loved ones; andWHEREAS, This action will help upgrade the Vietnam war from being classified as the Forgotten War; andWHEREAS, This action of patriotism would serve our Vietnam veterans; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 88 from the Nevada state line (approximately post mile 25) to 5 miles southwest (post mile 20) in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway; and be it furtherResolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184 CHAPTER 148 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES
3+ Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly April 05, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)February 26, 2018 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES
4+
5+ Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly April 05, 2018
6+
7+Enrolled August 15, 2018
8+Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018
9+Passed IN Assembly April 05, 2018
10+
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION
412
513 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 184
6-CHAPTER 148
14+
15+Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)February 26, 2018
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Member Bigelow(Coauthor: Senator Gaines)
18+February 26, 2018
719
820 Relative to the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.
9-
10- [ Filed with Secretary of State August 17, 2018. ]
1121
1222 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1323
1424 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1525
1626 ACR 184, Bigelow. Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway.
1727
1828 This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.
1929
2030 This measure would designate a specified portion of State Route 88 in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.
2131
2232 ## Digest Key
2333
2434 ## Bill Text
2535
2636 WHEREAS, Many residents of the County of Alpine, including many Washoe Tribal members and other community members, served in the United States military during the Vietnam war with the support of friends, family, and loves ones; and
2737
2838 WHEREAS, The naming of this section of State Route 88 will recognize the contributions and sacrifices of these veterans, their friends, families, and loved ones; and
2939
3040 WHEREAS, This action will help upgrade the Vietnam war from being classified as the Forgotten War; and
3141
3242 WHEREAS, This action of patriotism would serve our Vietnam veterans; now, therefore, be it
3343
3444 Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 88 from the Nevada state line (approximately post mile 25) to 5 miles southwest (post mile 20) in the County of Alpine as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Highway; and be it further
3545
3646 Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further
3747
3848 Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.