Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5284.) | ||
Senate | 08/01/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5863.) | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 7). | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2018 | Introduced. To print. |