Assembly
|
07/10/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5111.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2018
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|