Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at class="columnField" style="text-align:left">06/26/18 | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5967.) | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Introduced. To print. |