Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2017
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 724.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/07/2016
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|