Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5884.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2018
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/07/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2018
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|