1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 203 CHAPTER 51Relative to organ and tissue donation. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 01, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 203, Quirk-Silva. Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2018 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in California and would encourage all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Legislature has established an official state organ and tissue donor registry that has become the largest in the world, with over 14 million people signed up to save and heal the lives of others after death; andWHEREAS, The 12-year official partnership between Donate Life California and the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) has produced 95 percent of donors on the registry through the DMV with a simple check box; andWHEREAS, The Legislature has approved the innovative Living Donation California information and referral tool to encourage living kidney donation; andWHEREAS, The Superintendent of Public Instruction has recognized Donate Life Californias high school education program, which has educated students about organ, eye, and tissue donation for the past seven years; andWHEREAS, California has the greatest need for transplantation in the nation, with over 21,000 residents waiting for a second chance at life, representing one in five on the national waiting list; andWHEREAS, In 2017, the DMV was nationally recognized as the state agency with the greatest increase in donor designation in the country. This continuing increase in the registration of donors through the drivers license and state identification card application and renewal process continues to save more lives each year in California and around the country; andWHEREAS, Nine hundred fifty-eight Californians became organ donors in 2017 and 3,859 lifesaving transplants were performed in the state that year. Tragically, 975 people died while waiting due to the shortage of available organs; andWHEREAS, Sadly, in 2017, California had the longest waiting time in the nation for kidney transplants, and the most deaths while waiting; and WHEREAS, Only 46 percent of Californians sign up as donors, which is below the national average of 56 percent; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in recognition of the month of April as National Donate Life Month, the Legislature proclaims the month of April 2018 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That in doing so, the Legislature encourages all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry by checking YES! for organ and tissue donation when applying for or renewing a drivers license or identification card, or by signing up at www.donateLIFEcalifornia.org or www.doneVIDAcalifornia.org; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature underscores its renewed efforts to save more lives through donor registration and calls on all Members of the Legislature to consider how to share information about the cause, and how to better help their constituents in need; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled April 27, 2018 Passed IN Senate April 26, 2018 Passed IN Assembly April 09, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 203Introduced by Assembly Member Quirk-Silva(Coauthors: Assembly Members Frazier, Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Fong, Friedman, Gallagher, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, and Weber)March 14, 2018Relative to organ and tissue donation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 203, Quirk-Silva. Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month.This measure would proclaim the month of April 2018 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in California and would encourage all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Legislature has established an official state organ and tissue donor registry that has become the largest in the world, with over 14 million people signed up to save and heal the lives of others after death; andWHEREAS, The 12-year official partnership between Donate Life California and the Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) has produced 95 percent of donors on the registry through the DMV with a simple check box; andWHEREAS, The Legislature has approved the innovative Living Donation California information and referral tool to encourage living kidney donation; andWHEREAS, The Superintendent of Public Instruction has recognized Donate Life Californias high school education program, which has educated students about organ, eye, and tissue donation for the past seven years; andWHEREAS, California has the greatest need for transplantation in the nation, with over 21,000 residents waiting for a second chance at life, representing one in five on the national waiting list; andWHEREAS, In 2017, the DMV was nationally recognized as the state agency with the greatest increase in donor designation in the country. This continuing increase in the registration of donors through the drivers license and state identification card application and renewal process continues to save more lives each year in California and around the country; andWHEREAS, Nine hundred fifty-eight Californians became organ donors in 2017 and 3,859 lifesaving transplants were performed in the state that year. Tragically, 975 people died while waiting due to the shortage of available organs; andWHEREAS, Sadly, in 2017, California had the longest waiting time in the nation for kidney transplants, and the most deaths while waiting; and WHEREAS, Only 46 percent of Californians sign up as donors, which is below the national average of 56 percent; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in recognition of the month of April as National Donate Life Month, the Legislature proclaims the month of April 2018 as Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month in the State of California; and be it furtherResolved, That in doing so, the Legislature encourages all Californians to register with the Donate Life California Organ and Tissue Donor Registry by checking YES! for organ and tissue donation when applying for or renewing a drivers license or identification card, or by signing up at www.donateLIFEcalifornia.org or www.doneVIDAcalifornia.org; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature underscores its renewed efforts to save more lives through donor registration and calls on all Members of the Legislature to consider how to share information about the cause, and how to better help their constituents in need; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|