Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 103, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2025.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1139.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/09/2017
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|