Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3978.) | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4640.) | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Introduced. To print. |