Assembly | 05/24/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4222.) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4786.) | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | Introduced. To print. |