Assembly | 06/26/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4825.) | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5127.) | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Introduced. To print. |