Assembly | 08/30/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2230.) | ||
Senate | 08/22/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/12/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1124.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 20). | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2017 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2017 | Introduced. To print. |