Assembly | 06/13/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 91, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4516.) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5248.) | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | Introduced. To print. |