Assembly | 06/13/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4516.) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5134.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2018 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | Introduced. To print. |