Assembly | 09/06/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2018 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6872.). | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5807.) | ||
Senate | 08/21/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6257.) | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2018 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Introduced. To print. |