Assembly
|
08/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5279.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2018
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2018
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5821.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
Introduced measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|