1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 241 CHAPTER 137 Relative to cardiopulmonary resuscitation. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 241, Rodriguez. Cardiopulmonary resuscitation.This measure would declare the week of June 1, 2018, to June 7, 2018, inclusive, as Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Awareness Week in California, as specified.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Heart disease remains the leading cause of death in the United States and California; andWHEREAS, Heart disease affects men, women, and children of every age and race, regardless of where they live; andWHEREAS, More than 350,000 EMS-assessed out-of-hospital cardiac arrests occur in the United States; andWHEREAS, Approximately 90 percent of sudden cardiac arrest victims die before arriving at the hospital; andWHEREAS, Sudden cardiac arrest results from an abnormal heart rhythm in most adults; andWHEREAS, Nationally, only 46 percent of people who experience an out-of-hospital cardiac arrest receive immediate cardiopulmonary resuscitation by a bystander; andWHEREAS, Prompt delivery of cardiopulmonary resuscitation more than doubles the chance of survival from sudden cardiac arrest by helping to maintain vital blood flow to the heart and brain, increasing the amount of time that an electric shock from a defibrillator can be effective; andWHEREAS, It is often impossible for EMS personnel in California to arrive within 10 minutes of a 911 call, therefore achieving high survival rates depends on a public trained in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and automated external defibrillator use; andWHEREAS, It is important to increase awareness of the value of hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the week of June 1, 2018, to June 7, 2018, inclusive, to be Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Awareness Week in California, and that the residents of the State of California are encouraged to learn hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly June 07, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 241Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)May 15, 2018 Relative to cardiopulmonary resuscitation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 241, Rodriguez. Cardiopulmonary resuscitation.This measure would declare the week of June 1, 2018, to June 7, 2018, inclusive, as Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Awareness Week in California, as specified.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Heart disease remains the leading cause of death in the United States and California; andWHEREAS, Heart disease affects men, women, and children of every age and race, regardless of where they live; andWHEREAS, More than 350,000 EMS-assessed out-of-hospital cardiac arrests occur in the United States; andWHEREAS, Approximately 90 percent of sudden cardiac arrest victims die before arriving at the hospital; andWHEREAS, Sudden cardiac arrest results from an abnormal heart rhythm in most adults; andWHEREAS, Nationally, only 46 percent of people who experience an out-of-hospital cardiac arrest receive immediate cardiopulmonary resuscitation by a bystander; andWHEREAS, Prompt delivery of cardiopulmonary resuscitation more than doubles the chance of survival from sudden cardiac arrest by helping to maintain vital blood flow to the heart and brain, increasing the amount of time that an electric shock from a defibrillator can be effective; andWHEREAS, It is often impossible for EMS personnel in California to arrive within 10 minutes of a 911 call, therefore achieving high survival rates depends on a public trained in cardiopulmonary resuscitation and automated external defibrillator use; andWHEREAS, It is important to increase awareness of the value of hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the week of June 1, 2018, to June 7, 2018, inclusive, to be Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation and Automated External Defibrillator Awareness Week in California, and that the residents of the State of California are encouraged to learn hands-only cardiopulmonary resuscitation; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|