1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 249 CHAPTER 141 Relative to Fathers Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State August 17, 2018. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 249, Gallagher. Fathers Day.This measure would recognize June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day and would commend fathers and father figures present in their childrens lives.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For the past 100 years, the United States has recognized the contributions of fathers through the celebration of Fathers Day on the third Sunday in June; andWHEREAS, Fathers help provide the economic and emotional stability needed for children to succeed in life; andWHEREAS, Involved fathers help provide financial and in-home support for their families, which leads to better economic outcomes for their children; andWHEREAS, Children who have involved parents are less likely to become homeless, and have higher IQ scores at age three; andWHEREAS, Studies have shown that children whose fathers are involved have a decreased likelihood of becoming obese at a young age; andWHEREAS, Infants of involved fathers have positive cognitive and developmental outcomes, including improved weight gain and improved breastfeeding rates; andWHEREAS, Involved fathers contribute to higher linguistic abilities and academic achievement in their children; andWHEREAS, Fathers are a much needed source of social and emotional support, and reduce the risk of childhood depression in their children; andWHEREAS, Fathers provide structure for adulthood, for productive statesmanship, and for the skills to contribute to the well-being of ones neighbor and the global market; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day, and commends fathers and father figures who are present in their childrens lives; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature honors men that selflessly take up their responsibilities for the full development and maturation of their children; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature recognizes Fathers Day as an important day to reflect on the positive contributions of involved fathers and to celebrate fathers in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled August 15, 2018 Passed IN Senate August 13, 2018 Passed IN Assembly June 18, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 249Introduced by Assembly Member Gallagher(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Carrillo, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rivas, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)June 04, 2018 Relative to Fathers Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 249, Gallagher. Fathers Day.This measure would recognize June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day and would commend fathers and father figures present in their childrens lives.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, For the past 100 years, the United States has recognized the contributions of fathers through the celebration of Fathers Day on the third Sunday in June; andWHEREAS, Fathers help provide the economic and emotional stability needed for children to succeed in life; andWHEREAS, Involved fathers help provide financial and in-home support for their families, which leads to better economic outcomes for their children; andWHEREAS, Children who have involved parents are less likely to become homeless, and have higher IQ scores at age three; andWHEREAS, Studies have shown that children whose fathers are involved have a decreased likelihood of becoming obese at a young age; andWHEREAS, Infants of involved fathers have positive cognitive and developmental outcomes, including improved weight gain and improved breastfeeding rates; andWHEREAS, Involved fathers contribute to higher linguistic abilities and academic achievement in their children; andWHEREAS, Fathers are a much needed source of social and emotional support, and reduce the risk of childhood depression in their children; andWHEREAS, Fathers provide structure for adulthood, for productive statesmanship, and for the skills to contribute to the well-being of ones neighbor and the global market; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature recognizes June 17, 2018, as Fathers Day, and commends fathers and father figures who are present in their childrens lives; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature honors men that selflessly take up their responsibilities for the full development and maturation of their children; and be it furtherResolved, That the Legislature recognizes Fathers Day as an important day to reflect on the positive contributions of involved fathers and to celebrate fathers in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|