Assembly | 07/10/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/05/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5110.) | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/19/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 5847.) | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2018 | Introduced. To print. |