Assembly | 08/30/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5704.) | ||
Senate | 08/21/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/08/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | Introduced measure version corrected. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6062.) | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Introduced. To print. |