Assembly | 08/28/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5663.) | ||
Senate | 08/21/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6308.) | ||
Assembly | 08/16/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 9). | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Introduced. To print. |