Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 907.) | ||
Senate | 04/19/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 963.) | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30). | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2017 | Introduced. To print. |