California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR46 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/31/2017

                            Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 46 CHAPTER 136Relative to the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  August 31, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 46, Gray. The Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 132 in the City of Modesto as the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES Bill TextWHEREAS, On the morning of May 21, 1973, Officer Leo Volk, Jr., a three-year veteran of the Modesto Police Department, began pursuing a fugitive vehicle and, during the pursuit, became victim to a serious collision that left him pinned for 40 minutes before rescue crews could reach him; andWHEREAS, Officer Volk died from his injuries at 7:30 a.m. on May 21, 1973, leaving behind his wife and toddler son; andWHEREAS, Officer Volk gained the unfortunate distinction of being the first officer to die in the line of duty in the history of the Modesto Police Department; andWHEREAS, On the morning of July 29, 2002, a suspect fled from police and initiated a vehicle pursuit in which the suspect sped recklessly through a residential neighborhood, running multiple stop signs at a high rate of speed, and eventually ramming the patrol car of Sergeant Steve May; andWHEREAS, Sergeant May sustained major injuries, including a fractured skull and fractures to his face, jaw, clavicle, right forearm, and left leg; andWHEREAS, On July 23, 2009, Sergeant May died from complications resulting from the injuries he sustained in the 2002 collision, leaving behind his wife of 30 years and his two grown children, as well as his parents and sister; andWHEREAS, During their careers, Officer Volk and Sergeant May worked selflessly to make the City of Modesto and the State of California a safer place; andWHEREAS, It would be appropriate to memorialize the sacrifices made by Officer Volk and Sergeant May through a fitting tribute; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 132 from 6th Street to Garner Road and Claus Road (PM 19.010) in the City of Modesto as the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 46 CHAPTER 136Relative to the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway.  [ Filed with  Secretary of State  August 31, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 46, Gray. The Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway.This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 132 in the City of Modesto as the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: YES 

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 46
CHAPTER 136

Relative to the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway. 

 [ Filed with  Secretary of State  August 31, 2017. ] 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 46, Gray. The Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 132 in the City of Modesto as the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 132 in the City of Modesto as the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway. The measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, On the morning of May 21, 1973, Officer Leo Volk, Jr., a three-year veteran of the Modesto Police Department, began pursuing a fugitive vehicle and, during the pursuit, became victim to a serious collision that left him pinned for 40 minutes before rescue crews could reach him; and

WHEREAS, Officer Volk died from his injuries at 7:30 a.m. on May 21, 1973, leaving behind his wife and toddler son; and

WHEREAS, Officer Volk gained the unfortunate distinction of being the first officer to die in the line of duty in the history of the Modesto Police Department; and

WHEREAS, On the morning of July 29, 2002, a suspect fled from police and initiated a vehicle pursuit in which the suspect sped recklessly through a residential neighborhood, running multiple stop signs at a high rate of speed, and eventually ramming the patrol car of Sergeant Steve May; and

WHEREAS, Sergeant May sustained major injuries, including a fractured skull and fractures to his face, jaw, clavicle, right forearm, and left leg; and

WHEREAS, On July 23, 2009, Sergeant May died from complications resulting from the injuries he sustained in the 2002 collision, leaving behind his wife of 30 years and his two grown children, as well as his parents and sister; and

WHEREAS, During their careers, Officer Volk and Sergeant May worked selflessly to make the City of Modesto and the State of California a safer place; and

WHEREAS, It would be appropriate to memorialize the sacrifices made by Officer Volk and Sergeant May through a fitting tribute; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 132 from 6th Street to Garner Road and Claus Road (PM 19.010) in the City of Modesto as the Modesto Police Officer Leo Volk, Jr., and Modesto Police Sergeant Steve May Memorial Highway; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further 

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.