Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 76.) | ||
Senate | 01/13/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 153.) | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2017 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2017 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 9). | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2017 | Introduced. To print. |