Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2025.) | ||
Senate | 07/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2017 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1804.) | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2017 | Introduced. To print. |