Assembly | 02/24/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 220.) | ||
Senate | 02/17/2017 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 369.) | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 6). | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/05/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2017 | Introduced. To print. |