1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 60 CHAPTER 58 Relative to autism. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 06, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 60, Grayson. Autism: sensory-friendly movie screenings.This measure would declare the support of the Legislature for the expansion of sensory-friendly movie screenings and similar programs for people with autism, and would encourage families to attend a sensory-friendly movie screening during April 2017, National Autism Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; andWHEREAS, More than 3.5 million Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; andWHEREAS, Individuals with autism often utilize specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support their families resilience as they manage the unique psychological and financial conditions autism presents; andWHEREAS, Attending a movie theater with family members is an enriching and enjoyable experience for many Californians; andWHEREAS, Theaters around the country have begun to offer Sensory Friendly Screenings as a special opportunity for individuals with autism and others to enjoy their favorite films in a safe and accepting setting; andWHEREAS, In order to provide a more comfortable and accepting environment for individuals on the autism spectrum, the movie auditorium keeps the sound turned slightly down and the lights turned slightly up; andWHEREAS, Because some individuals with autism have specialized dietary needs, families are allowed to bring their own snacks from home; andWHEREAS, Audience members are free to get up and dance, walk, sing, or shout, and are able to relax and enjoy quality family time without worrying if someone will complain or be disturbed by movement or noise; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature supports and promotes the expansion of sensory-friendly screenings and similar programs, and encourages families to attend a sensory-friendly screening during April 2017, National Autism Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 30, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 26, 2017 Passed IN Assembly April 27, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 60Introduced by Assembly Member Grayson(Principal coauthor: Senator Hueso)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Travis Allen, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Burke, Caballero, Chau, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gonzalez Fletcher, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rodriguez, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 17, 2017 Relative to autism. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 60, Grayson. Autism: sensory-friendly movie screenings.This measure would declare the support of the Legislature for the expansion of sensory-friendly movie screenings and similar programs for people with autism, and would encourage families to attend a sensory-friendly movie screening during April 2017, National Autism Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; andWHEREAS, More than 3.5 million Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; andWHEREAS, Individuals with autism often utilize specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support their families resilience as they manage the unique psychological and financial conditions autism presents; andWHEREAS, Attending a movie theater with family members is an enriching and enjoyable experience for many Californians; andWHEREAS, Theaters around the country have begun to offer Sensory Friendly Screenings as a special opportunity for individuals with autism and others to enjoy their favorite films in a safe and accepting setting; andWHEREAS, In order to provide a more comfortable and accepting environment for individuals on the autism spectrum, the movie auditorium keeps the sound turned slightly down and the lights turned slightly up; andWHEREAS, Because some individuals with autism have specialized dietary needs, families are allowed to bring their own snacks from home; andWHEREAS, Audience members are free to get up and dance, walk, sing, or shout, and are able to relax and enjoy quality family time without worrying if someone will complain or be disturbed by movement or noise; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature supports and promotes the expansion of sensory-friendly screenings and similar programs, and encourages families to attend a sensory-friendly screening during April 2017, National Autism Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|