Assembly | 07/03/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1712.) | ||
Senate | 06/20/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 6). | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1532.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | Introduced. To print. |