Assembly | 06/06/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1281.) | ||
Senate | 05/26/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.) | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2017 | Introduced. To print. |