Assembly | 06/13/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 06/13/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1464.) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1637.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | Introduced. To print. |