Assembly | 08/21/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 159, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2018 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.) | ||
Senate | 08/07/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 09/18/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/16/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3544.) | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (September 13). | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2017 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Introduced. To print. |