1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 73 CHAPTER 63 Relative to Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 06, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 73, Berman. Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day.This measure would declare May 6, 2017, as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Moyamoya disease is a rare, progressive, incurable disorder of the cerebrovascular system that causes arteries at the base of the brain to narrow, resulting in blocked blood flow to the brain; andWHEREAS, To compensate for the blockage, the body forms a tangle of tiny blood vessels that resemble a puff of smoke; andWHEREAS, The term moyamoya means puff of smoke in Japanese, which is how the tangle appeared to Japanese doctors who first described the disorder in the 1960s; andWHEREAS, Moyamoya may lead to transient ischemic attacks (TIA), commonly referred to as mini strokes, in both children and adults, followed by muscular weakness or paralysis on one side of the body, or seizures; andWHEREAS, Other symptoms of the disorder include vision problems, disturbed consciousness, reduced cognitive ability, distorted functioning of senses, involuntary movements, and aphasia, a speech problem that impairs language comprehension; andWHEREAS, Because the arteries continue to narrow, surgery is needed to prevent mental decline and recurrent strokes; andWHEREAS, Moyamoya does not discriminate, affecting people of all ethnicities, ages, and genders; andWHEREAS, Moyamoya affects approximately one in every one-to-two million people. However, it is suspected that a large portion of the population is currently misdiagnosed or underdiagnosed due to lack of awareness among both the public and physicians; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares May 6, 2017, as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 30, 2017 Passed IN Senate May 26, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 04, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 73Introduced by Assembly Member Berman(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Burke, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chen, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Gray, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Quirk, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)April 24, 2017 Relative to Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 73, Berman. Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day.This measure would declare May 6, 2017, as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Moyamoya disease is a rare, progressive, incurable disorder of the cerebrovascular system that causes arteries at the base of the brain to narrow, resulting in blocked blood flow to the brain; andWHEREAS, To compensate for the blockage, the body forms a tangle of tiny blood vessels that resemble a puff of smoke; andWHEREAS, The term moyamoya means puff of smoke in Japanese, which is how the tangle appeared to Japanese doctors who first described the disorder in the 1960s; andWHEREAS, Moyamoya may lead to transient ischemic attacks (TIA), commonly referred to as mini strokes, in both children and adults, followed by muscular weakness or paralysis on one side of the body, or seizures; andWHEREAS, Other symptoms of the disorder include vision problems, disturbed consciousness, reduced cognitive ability, distorted functioning of senses, involuntary movements, and aphasia, a speech problem that impairs language comprehension; andWHEREAS, Because the arteries continue to narrow, surgery is needed to prevent mental decline and recurrent strokes; andWHEREAS, Moyamoya does not discriminate, affecting people of all ethnicities, ages, and genders; andWHEREAS, Moyamoya affects approximately one in every one-to-two million people. However, it is suspected that a large portion of the population is currently misdiagnosed or underdiagnosed due to lack of awareness among both the public and physicians; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby declares May 6, 2017, as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|