1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 87 CHAPTER 83 Relative to Emergency Medical Services Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 13, 2017. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 87, Rodriguez. Emergency Medical Services Week.This measure would declare the week of May 21, 2017, to May 27, 2017, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, It is estimated that there are over 840,000 emergency medical services personnel in the United States, including over 80,000 in the State of California; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical services are a vital public service and the members of emergency medical services teams are ready to provide life-saving care to those in need 24 hours a day, seven days a week; andWHEREAS, The emergency medical service system consists of emergency physicians, emergency nurses, emergency medical technicians, paramedics, firefighters, educators, administrators, and others; andWHEREAS, The members of emergency medical services teams, whether career or volunteer, engage in thousands of hours of specialized training and continuing education to enhance their life-saving skills; and WHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers are dedicated to saving lives and possess a sense of duty to aid others that is inherent in the profession and that stays with an emergency medical service provider for life; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers have made significant sacrifices in the course of duty, including the loss of life in service of others; andWHEREAS, Approximately 25 to 30 million patients nationwide, and over 2 million patients in California, receive emergency medical services each year; andWHEREAS, Access to quality emergency medical care dramatically improves the survival and recovery rates of those who experience sudden illness or injury; andWHEREAS, The American College of Emergency Physicians was instrumental in establishing National Emergency Medical Services Week to honor the life-saving efforts of emergency medical services personnel; andWHEREAS, President Gerald Ford proclaimed the first National Emergency Medical Services Week in November of 1974; andWHEREAS, This year marks the 43rd anniversary of National Emergency Medical Services Week; andWHEREAS, The theme of National Emergency Medical Services Week is EMS STRONG: Always in Service; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize the value and accomplishments of emergency medical services personnel by designating Emergency Medical Services Week in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of May 21, 2017, to May 27, 2017, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 08, 2017 Passed IN Senate June 08, 2017 Passed IN Assembly May 22, 2017 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 87Introduced by Assembly Member Rodriguez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Acosta, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Baker, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Bocanegra, Bonta, Brough, Caballero, Calderon, Cervantes, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooley, Cooper, Cunningham, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Gipson, Gloria, Gomez, Gonzalez Fletcher, Grayson, Harper, Holden, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Obernolte, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Rubio, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, and Wood)May 03, 2017 Relative to Emergency Medical Services Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 87, Rodriguez. Emergency Medical Services Week.This measure would declare the week of May 21, 2017, to May 27, 2017, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, It is estimated that there are over 840,000 emergency medical services personnel in the United States, including over 80,000 in the State of California; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical services are a vital public service and the members of emergency medical services teams are ready to provide life-saving care to those in need 24 hours a day, seven days a week; andWHEREAS, The emergency medical service system consists of emergency physicians, emergency nurses, emergency medical technicians, paramedics, firefighters, educators, administrators, and others; andWHEREAS, The members of emergency medical services teams, whether career or volunteer, engage in thousands of hours of specialized training and continuing education to enhance their life-saving skills; and WHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers are dedicated to saving lives and possess a sense of duty to aid others that is inherent in the profession and that stays with an emergency medical service provider for life; andWHEREAS, Emergency medical service providers have made significant sacrifices in the course of duty, including the loss of life in service of others; andWHEREAS, Approximately 25 to 30 million patients nationwide, and over 2 million patients in California, receive emergency medical services each year; andWHEREAS, Access to quality emergency medical care dramatically improves the survival and recovery rates of those who experience sudden illness or injury; andWHEREAS, The American College of Emergency Physicians was instrumental in establishing National Emergency Medical Services Week to honor the life-saving efforts of emergency medical services personnel; andWHEREAS, President Gerald Ford proclaimed the first National Emergency Medical Services Week in November of 1974; andWHEREAS, This year marks the 43rd anniversary of National Emergency Medical Services Week; andWHEREAS, The theme of National Emergency Medical Services Week is EMS STRONG: Always in Service; andWHEREAS, It is appropriate to recognize the value and accomplishments of emergency medical services personnel by designating Emergency Medical Services Week in California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of May 21, 2017, to May 27, 2017, inclusive, to be Emergency Medical Services Week in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|