Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2829.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2232.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2017
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2017
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2406.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2017
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|