LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR99
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR99
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR99
Action History
Assembly
08/31/2017
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bigelow.
Assembly
06/27/2017
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27).
Assembly
06/12/2017
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
Assembly
06/06/2017
From printer.
Assembly
06/05/2017
Introduced. To print.