Assembly | 08/28/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2173.) | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 6). | ||
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1531.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10). | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 12/06/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 12/05/2016 | Introduced. To print. |