California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR16 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2017

Amended

Bill August 31, 2017
Bill June 22, 2017