Assembly | 07/21/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/17/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2071.) | ||
Senate | 07/11/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2315.) | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2017 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2017 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2017 | Introduced. To print. |