Assembly | 09/25/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 208, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/25/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2017 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3383.). | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2763.) | ||
Senate | 09/06/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2017 | Measure version as amended on September 5 corrected. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2767.) | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2017 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 07/20/2017 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 11). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2017 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2017 | Introduced. To print. |