Assembly | 09/19/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 164, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 2566.) | ||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2683.) | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 10). | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2017 | Introduced. To print. |