Assembly | 08/27/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 5437.) | ||
Senate | 06/26/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Senate | 05/30/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 2. Page 5205.) | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20). | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2018 | Introduced. To print. |