Assembly | 06/19/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4662.) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 3. Page 5001.) | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2018 | Introduced. To print. |