Assembly | 08/15/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/09/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/09/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 5230.) | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 5003.) | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2018 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | Introduced. To print. |