Assembly | 05/24/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4222.) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4896.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Introduced. To print. |