Assembly | 09/05/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5838.) | ||
Senate | 08/14/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 13). | ||
Senate | 07/03/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5932.) | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 20). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2018 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | Introduced. To print. |