Senate | 08/31/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 7046.) | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 28). | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2018 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2018 | Introduced. To print. |