Senate | 08/31/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 4. Page 7045.) | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2018 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6560.) | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2018 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/06/2018 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2018 | Introduced. To print. |