Assembly | 09/25/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 207, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/25/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2017 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3386.). | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2794.) | ||
Senate | 09/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/08/2017 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 30). | ||
Senate | 08/23/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. | ||
Senate | 07/18/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2573.) | ||
Assembly | 07/17/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2017 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2017 | Introduced. To print. |