Assembly | 07/05/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 96, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 3. Page 1803.) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 13). | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 1643.) | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Coms. on P.E., R., & S.S. and HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | Introduced. To print. |